on June 12, 2021.
and her husband, Adam, welcomed a daughter, Sloane Penelope Galvan, on Jan. 8, 2022.
started as a subcontract administrator in the aerospace and defense industry with United Launch Alliance.
Kim Still '88
Kim Still retired from the Illinois Department of Corrections in Jacksonville, Ill., after 27 years of service.
Dan Layzell '85
Dan Layzell has been named interim president and chief executive officer of the Louisiana State University Foundation. He will continue to serve as LSU鈥檚 vice president for finance and administration/chief financial officer during his interim role at the foundation.
Dennis Litteken '83
Dennis Litteken was inducted into the Illinois Football Coaches Association Hall of Fame on April 2 in Champaign, Ill. The former Breese Mater Dei head coach is currently the school鈥檚 principaland assistant coach.
Peter Simoncelli '82
Peter Simoncelli was appointed general manager at The Ritz-Carlton in Chicago, Ill.
Kate Windhorst Woods '80
Kate Windhorst Woods is a home educating administrator for Lakeland Church in Gurnee, Ill.
Ann Bishop Prather '80
Ann Bishop Prather was appointed a Passavant Area Hospital Foundation trustee for the hospital in Jacksonville, Ill.
Mark Travous '78
Mark Travous is an IT manager for Munger Farms in Delano, Calif.
Janice Kurtock Chiaradonna '78
51成人 extends its sympathy to Janice Kurtock Chiaradonna on the death of her husband, Cesare Chiaradonna, on February 1, 2017.
David Alan Taylor '77
David Alan Taylor recently retired from Aris Radiology in Nashville, Tenn.
Mary Tierney Hengels '72
51成人 extends its sympathy to Mary Tierney Hengels on the death of her husband, William Hengels, on November 27, 2016.
Gary Curtis '57
51成人 extends its sympathy to Gary Curtis on the death of his wife, Betty Curtis, on April 4, 2017.
Mary Ascoli-Keck '06,
May 15, 2017
Allie Hodlmair Colt '94,
May 6, 2017
Lois Cruse Adkins '70,
June 28, 2017
Paula Touhy Sargent-King '68
(Gamma Delta) September 12, 2016
Martin J. 鈥淢arty鈥 Buker '65
December 5, 2015
Larry B. Stowers '63
(Phi Alpha) June 17, 2017
Edwin P. Earle '60,
December 3, 2015
Clyde E. Smith '59,
April 23, 2017
James D. 鈥淛im鈥 Bonds '57,
May 7, 2017